blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0869468

EP0869468 - A method of displaying a high-density dot-matrix image data and system therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.08.2009
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR, LU
published on 20.07.2011  [2011/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AVIX INC.
2-1-1, Minatomirai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 220-8129 / JP
[2008/35]
Former [1998/41]For all designated states
AVIX INC.
1-1, Fukuura 1-chome, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tokimoto, Toyotaro
200-30, Matsuura-cho, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Oishi, Masatoshi
1-6-11, Takafunedai, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[1998/41]
Representative(s)Charlton, Peter John
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Charlton, Peter John
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [1998/41]Finnie, Peter John
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date98302118.920.03.1998
[1998/41]
Priority number, dateJP1997006845721.03.1997         Original published format: JP 6845797
JP1997025237217.09.1997         Original published format: JP 25237297
[1998/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0869468
Date:07.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0869468
Date:10.05.2000
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0869468
Date:08.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2000
ClassificationIPC:G09G3/32, G09G3/20, G09G1/16
[2000/02]
CPC:
G09G3/20 (EP,US); G09G3/32 (EP,KR,US); G09F9/33 (KR);
G09G5/36 (KR); G09G2340/0407 (EP,US); G09G2340/0414 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0421 (EP,US); G09G3/30 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1998/41]G09G3/32, G09G3/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/41]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Anzeige von Rasterbilddaten hoher Dichte und Anordnung dafür[1998/41]
English:A method of displaying a high-density dot-matrix image data and system therefor[1998/41]
French:Procédé d'affichage de données d'image à matrice de points à haute densité et dispositif pour sa mise en oeuvre[1998/41]
Examination procedure16.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
21.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2008Fee for grant paid
02.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38]
Request for further processing for:09.07.2007Request for further processing filed
11.07.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.07.2007Decision despatched
07.03.2005Request for further processing filed
07.03.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.03.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
SE08.01.2009
GR09.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
GB20.03.2009
IE20.03.2009
LU20.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
[2011/25]
Former [2010/44]AT08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
SE08.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
GB20.03.2009
IE20.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/28]AT08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
SE08.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
GB20.03.2009
IE20.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/19]AT08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
SE08.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
IE20.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/07]AT08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
SE08.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
IE20.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/05]AT08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
SE08.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2009/30]AT08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
PT17.02.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]US4779135  (JUDD THOMAS H [US]) [A] 1,5,12 * Abstract *; column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 68; figure 1 *;
 [A]  - W.J.A.M. HARTMANN, "Ferroelectric Liquid Crystal Displays for Television Application", FERROELECTRICS, (1991), vol. 122, pages 1 - 26, XP000764864 [A] 1,5-7,12 * Abstract *; page 3, line 33 - page 5, line 2; figures 2-4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00150199108226025
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.