blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0867776

EP0867776 - Exposure method, exposure apparatus and method for making an exposure apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.04.2005  [2005/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/40]For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamamoto, Naoyuki, c/o Nikon Corporation
2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1998/40]
Representative(s)Rackham, Stephen Neil
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/40]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98302174.224.03.1998
[1998/40]
Priority number, dateJP1997009146126.03.1997         Original published format: JP 9146197
[1998/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0867776
Date:30.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0867776
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:G03F9/02
[1998/40]
CPC:
G03F9/7026 (EP); H01L21/30 (KR); G03F7/707 (EP);
G03F7/70716 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/40]
TitleGerman:Belichtungsverfahren, Belichtungsapparat und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Belichtungsapparates[1998/40]
English:Exposure method, exposure apparatus and method for making an exposure apparatus[1998/40]
French:Méthode d'exposition, appareil d'exposition et méthode de fabrication d'un appareil d'exposition[1998/40]
Examination procedure17.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
25.02.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5461237  (WAKAMOTO SHINJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 10, line 19 - column 12, line 58 * * figures 3,4,10 *;
 [E]EP0848299  (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [E] 1,7,9 * column 9, line 37 - column 11, line 53 * * figure - *;
 [E]EP0833208  (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [E] 1,7,9 * page 8, line 13 - line 41 * * figures 6,8,9 *;
 [PX]JPH1074687  ;
 [PX]JPH1070065  ;
 [A]US5114234  (OTSUKA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,7,9 * abstract * * column 4, line 11 - line 68 *;
 [DA]JPH05283310
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 8, & JP10074687 A 19980317 (NIKON CORP) [PX] 1,7,9
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 8, & JP10070065 A 19980310 (NIKON CORP) [PX] 1,7,9
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940202), vol. 018, no. 063, Database accession no. (E - 1500), & JP05283310 A 19931029 (NIKON CORP) [DA] 1,7,9 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.