EP0903685 - Ic card connector device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishioka, Toru 2-6 Sakae-cho Furukawa-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302425.8 | 30.03.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | JP19970255392 | 19.09.1997 Original published format: JP 25539297 | JP19980004786 | 13.01.1998 Original published format: JP 478698 | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0903685 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0903685 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06K13/08 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
G06K13/0806 (EP,US);
G06K7/0047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/32] |
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | IC-Kartenverbinder | [1999/12] | English: | Ic card connector device | [1999/12] | French: | Connecteur pour carte à puce | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/07] | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0704939 (HIROSE ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 44 - column 7, line 20 ** figures 1-9 *; | [X]US5575669 (LIN CAROL S M [TW], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 9 - column 4, line 14 * * figures 1-12 * |