Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0869467

EP0869467 - Image display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP
Former [1998/41]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawahara, Isao
6-15-21, Kibougaoka, Toyono-cho
Toyona-gun, Osaka 563-0214 / JP
[1998/41]
Representative(s)Crawford, Andrew Birkby , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/41]Crawford, Andrew Birkby , et al
A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date98302551.101.04.1998
[1998/41]
Priority number, dateJP1997008361402.04.1997         Original published format: JP 8361497
JP1997012924920.05.1997         Original published format: JP 12924997
JP1997016225819.06.1997         Original published format: JP 16225897
[1998/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0869467
Date:07.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0869467
Date:27.10.1999
[1999/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0869467
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/28, G09G3/34
[1999/44]
Former International [1998/41]G09G3/28
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/27]
Former [1998/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bildanzeigevorrichtung[1998/41]
English:Image display apparatus[1998/41]
French:Appareil d'affichage d'images[1998/41]
Examination procedure27.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
28.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.03.2003Fee for grant paid
04.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Divisional application(s)EP03011152.0  / EP1359561
EP10185920.5  / EP2339569
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Request for further processing for:08.04.2003Request for further processing filed
10.04.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.04.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0698874  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC.) [X] 1,2,8,9,12,13,18-20 * abstract * * column 4, line 51 - column 6, line 25; figures 4-6 * [A] 5-7,10,11,14,21-32;
 [A]EP0646906  (IBM CORP.) [A] 22-32 * abstract * * page 2, line 9 - page 4, line 2 * * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 44; figure 3; tables 1,2 *;
 [A]JPH07261696  ;
 [A]JPH07248743
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 96, no. 2, & JP07261696 A 19951013 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD.) [A] 1-32 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 96, no. 1, & JP07248743 A 19950926 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD.) [A] 1-32 * abstract *