Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0869602

EP0869602 - Power supply device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.03.2004  [2004/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha TEC
570 Ohito, Ohito-cho Tagata-gun
Shizuoka-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/41]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha TEC
570 Ohito, Ohito-cho
Tagata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Amano, Takashi, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TEC
Mishima-kojyo, 6-78, Minami-cho
Mishima-shi, Shizuoka / JP
[1998/41]
Representative(s)Brookes IP
Windsor House
6-10 Mount Ephraim Road
Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/29]Brookes Batchellor
102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
Former [1998/41]BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO.
2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road
London EC1R 0DS / GB
Application number, filing date98302623.803.04.1998
[1998/41]
Priority number, dateJP1997008703104.04.1997         Original published format: JP 8703197
[1998/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0869602
Date:07.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0869602
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02M1/12, H05B41/28
[1998/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/37]
Former [1998/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Stromversorgungsvorrichtung[1998/41]
English:Power supply device[1998/41]
French:Dispositif d'alimentation de puissance[1998/41]
Examination procedure29.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/41]
15.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/12]
14.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0851719  (TEC) [E] 1-23 * column 10, line 16 - column 13, line 31 * * column 14, line 33 - line 56; figures 1-10 *;
 [XA]US5331534  (SUZUKI ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10,12 * column 4, line 50 - column 10, line 32 * * column 11, line 9 - line 45; figures 1-6,9-13 * [A] 6,11,13-23;
 [X]EP0617567  (TOSHIBA LIGHTING&TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,12 * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 39; figures 8,9 *;
 [XA]JPH07192880  ;
 [A]EP0654886  (PHILIPS) [A] 1,2,4,8,9,12 * column 7, line 50 - column 13, line 17; figures 1-2G *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1955, no. 10, & JP07192880 A 19950728 (TOSHIBA) [X] 1,2,4,12 * abstract * [A] 5,7-9