Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0874039 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0874039



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 677
29.01.2018 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
29.01.2018 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
22.01.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
24.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.11.2017 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.10.2017 Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) Opposition 3
11.10.2017 Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) Opposition 3
23.06.2017 Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit Opposition 2
06.02.2017 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
06.02.2017 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
06.02.2017 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
27.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
23.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.01.2017 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Opposition 1
23.01.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 7
05.08.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
05.08.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.01.2016 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
20.01.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.08.2015 Amended description with annotations Opposition 3
28.08.2015 Description Opposition 2
28.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
28.08.2015 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.06.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
08.06.2015 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
08.06.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.06.2015 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
28.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.03.2014 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 31
12.03.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.03.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.11.2013 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
21.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.10.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.07.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.07.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.07.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
19.07.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
16.07.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.07.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
14.02.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
08.02.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 16
12.08.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
08.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.08.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
08.08.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
08.08.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.08.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.08.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
08.08.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.08.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 7
14.06.2011 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
03.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.06.2011 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.06.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.06.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.04.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
07.04.2011 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 4
06.04.2011 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 4
28.01.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.01.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
25.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.01.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
02.12.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
22.11.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
19.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.11.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
13.10.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.10.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.09.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.09.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.09.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
22.09.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
22.09.2010 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.09.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
22.09.2010 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
22.09.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.09.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.09.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
22.09.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
22.09.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
22.09.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.09.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
01.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
25.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
25.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
25.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
25.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
25.06.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
25.06.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
16.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
09.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.06.2010 Claims Opposition 1
09.06.2010 Claims Opposition 1
09.06.2010 Claims Opposition 1
09.06.2010 Claims Opposition 1
09.06.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
09.06.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.02.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
25.02.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.02.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
25.02.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
29.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
27.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.05.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
13.05.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
11.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.03.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
05.03.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.11.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.11.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.10.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.10.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
04.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
04.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
04.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
04.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.09.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.09.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
30.09.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
30.09.2008 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
06.12.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.10.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
31.10.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
31.10.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
29.10.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
29.10.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
29.10.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.06.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
26.06.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
26.06.2007 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.06.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
11.06.2007 Preparation of grant Search / examination 1
15.11.2006 Description Search / examination 1
15.11.2006 Description Search / examination 1
15.11.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.11.2006 Description Search / examination 1
14.11.2006 Description Search / examination 1
14.11.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.09.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.09.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.09.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.05.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.05.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.03.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.02.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.02.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
10.02.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 4
09.01.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.12.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
20.12.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.12.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.03.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
11.03.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
11.03.2005 Description Search / examination 3
11.03.2005 Description Search / examination 3
11.03.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.03.2005 Annex Search / examination 1
10.03.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
10.03.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
10.03.2005 Description Search / examination 3
10.03.2005 Description Search / examination 3
10.03.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.01.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.12.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.09.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
06.09.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.08.2004 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
01.04.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
01.04.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
01.04.2004 Description Search / examination 2
01.04.2004 Description Search / examination 2
01.04.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.03.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.03.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.11.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
10.11.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.08.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
25.08.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
25.08.2003 Description Search / examination 6
25.08.2003 Description Search / examination 6
25.08.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.08.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 19
20.06.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.06.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.02.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.02.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.12.2002 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.12.2002 General enquiry Search / examination 1
21.10.1998 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
14.09.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.09.1998 European search report Search / examination 3
26.08.1998 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
28.07.1998 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.04.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.04.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
22.04.1998 Description Search / examination 12
22.04.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.1998 Priority document Search / examination 19
22.04.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7