Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0877309

EP0877309 - Virtual vehicle sensors based on neural networks trained using data generated by simulation models [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc.
Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, One Parkland Boulevard
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/46]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc.
Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard
Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cheng, Jie
2406, Meadowridge Court
Ann Arbor, Michigan 48105 / US
02 / LaCrosse, Stephanie Mary
971O Andrew Avenue
Allen Park, Michigan 48101 / US
03 / Tascillo, Anya Lynn
4537 Sheldon Road
Canton, Michigan 48188 / US
04 / Newman, Charles Edward, Jr.
24785, Joyce
Flat Rock, Michigan 48134 / US
05 / Davis, George Carver
6188, Riverwood Drive
Ypsilanti, Michigan 48198 / US
[1998/46]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
A. Messulam & Co. Ltd. 43-45 High Road Bushy Heath Bushy
Hertfordshire WD23 1EE / GB
Former [1998/46]Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
A. Messulam & Co., 24 Broadway
Leigh-on-Sea, Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date98303453.901.05.1998
[1998/46]
Priority number, dateUS1997085282907.05.1997         Original published format: US 852829
[1998/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0877309
Date:11.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0877309
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:G05B23/02, F02D41/26
[1998/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/29]
Former [1998/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Virtuelle Fahrzeugsensoren auf der Basis neuronaler Netze, die mittels durch Simulationsmodelle erzeugter Daten angelernt werden[1998/46]
English:Virtual vehicle sensors based on neural networks trained using data generated by simulation models[1998/46]
French:Capteurs virtuels pour vehicules basés sur des réseaux neuronaux entrainés à partir de données générées par des modèles de simulation[1998/46]
Examination procedure27.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/04]
04.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2000Fee for grant paid
08.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5539638  (KEELER JAMES D [US], et al) [X] 5-10 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 5 * * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 20 * * column 11, line 52 - column 12, line 13 * * column 14, line 32 - column 16, line 47 * * figures 2,4,13 * [A] 1-4;
 [A]US5361213  (FUJIEDA MAMORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,9 * abstract * * figures 1,32,55 *;
 [A]US5583964  (WANG SHAY-PING T [US]) [A] 8 * column A * * column 5, line 56 - line 61 *