Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0914918

EP0914918 - Porous tubular prostheses and method for making the same co-spraying water soluble and water insoluble fibrous components onto a rotating mandrel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.01.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.02.2005  [2005/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHNEIDER (USA) INC.
5905 Nathan Lane Plymouth
Minnesota 55442 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]For all designated states
SCHNEIDER (USA) INC.
5905 Nathan Lane
Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Leidner, Jacob
20 Lyonsgate Drive
North York, Ontario, M3H 1C8 / CA
02 / Amellal, Karim
455 Revland Drive
Tecumseh, Ontario, N8N 4T2 / CA
[1999/19]
Representative(s)Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street
London W1M 8AH / GB
Application number, filing date98303484.405.05.1998
[1999/19]
Priority number, dateUS19970048091P30.05.1997         Original published format: US 48091 P
[1999/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0914918
Date:12.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0914918
Date:14.02.2001
[2001/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0914918
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/04, B29K105/04, B29K105/06, B29C67/20, B29C41/08
[2001/07]
Former International [1999/19]B29C41/08, A61F2/04, B29K105/04, B29K105/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/44]
Former [1999/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Röhrenförmige poröse Prothese und Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben durch kooperatives Sprühen von wasserlöslichen und wasserunlöslichen faserartigen Komponenten auf einem rotierenden Dorn[1999/19]
English:Porous tubular prostheses and method for making the same co-spraying water soluble and water insoluble fibrous components onto a rotating mandrel[1999/19]
French:Prothèse tubulaire poreuse et méthode pour sa fabrication par co-aspersion sur un mandrin en rotation de composés solubles et non-solubles à l'eau[1999/19]
Examination procedure07.06.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
15.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
16.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2003Fee for grant paid
27.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Request for further processing for:08.07.2002Request for further processing filed
08.07.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.07.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0332371  (DOW CORNING WRIGHT CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,26,27 * the whole document * [Y] 11-13,22,28;
 [Y]US4834755  (SILVESTRINI THOMAS A [US], et al) [Y] 11-13,22,28 * example - *;
 [A]US4738740  (PINCHUK LEONARD [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3700380  (KITRILAKIS SOTIRIS) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0143638  (SHILEY INC [US]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2416686  (INST TEXTIL & FASERFORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 2,3,10,21,26 * the whole document *