EP0880270 - Digital copying method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2001 [2001/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Kwang-seuk 709-1404 Seokwang APT Youngtong-dong Paldal-gu Suwon, Kyonggi-do / KR | [1999/03] |
Former [1998/48] | 01 /
Kim, Kwang-seuk 102-107, Hyundai APT., Jungja-dong Jangan-gu, Suwon, Kyonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Macdonald, Kate, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Leopold Street Sheffield S1 2QD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Ellis, Kate, Dr., et al Dibb Lupton Alsop, Fountain Precinct Balm Green, Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304023.9 | 20.05.1998 | [1998/48] | Priority number, date | KR19970019370 | 20.05.1997 Original published format: KR 9719370 | [1998/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0880270 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0880270 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04N1/393 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
G03G15/04 (KR);
H04N1/32358 (EP);
H04N1/32491 (EP);
H04N1/393 (EP);
H04N2201/0081 (EP);
H04N2201/0082 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1998/48] | H04N1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/52] |
Former [1998/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Digitales Kopierverfahren | [1998/48] | English: | Digital copying method | [1998/48] | French: | Procédé numérique à copier | [1998/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/51] | 12.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0660584 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-8,14,15 * abstract * * column 9, line 54 - column 10, line 1 * * column 15, line 4 - line 10 * [Y] 10-13; | [XY]EP0497440 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 9, line 7 - line 23 * * column 11, line 11 - line 18 * [Y] 12,13; | [Y]US4687944 (MITSUKA IKUO [JP], et al) [Y] 10-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 21 - line 64 * * column 6, line 12 - column 7, line 25 *; | [A]US5311259 (MORIYA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [A] 9,12,13 * abstract * * column 10, line 3 - line 38; figures 14,16 *; | [A]EP0259138 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 12 * column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 42; figures 1,2 * |