Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0880227

EP0880227 - Filters utilizing thin film stacked crystal filter structures and thin film bulk acoustic wave resonators [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.06.2008
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [1998/48]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Ella, Juha
Tyynelankatu 5 AS. 7
24260 Salo / FI
[1998/48]
Representative(s)Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
Byron House
Cambridge Business Park
Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/01]Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej , et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
Former [2000/49]Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Former [1998/48]Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace , et al
Patent Department, Nokia Mobile Phones, St Georges Court, St Georges Road
Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB
Application number, filing date98304059.321.05.1998
[1998/48]
Priority number, dateUS1997086121621.05.1997         Original published format: US 861216
[1998/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0880227
Date:25.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0880227
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0880227
Date:08.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H03H9/58
[1998/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/51]
Former [1998/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Filter mit gestapelten Dünnschichtfilterstrukturen und Dünnfilmresonatoren mit akustischen Volumenwellen[1998/48]
English:Filters utilizing thin film stacked crystal filter structures and thin film bulk acoustic wave resonators[1998/48]
French:Filtres utilisant des structures de filtre à cristal à couches minces empilées et résonateurs à ondes acoustiques de volume à couche mince[1998/48]
Examination procedure14.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
07.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
18.05.2007Fee for grant paid
18.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29]
Request for further processing for:18.05.2007Request for further processing filed
18.05.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.06.2007Decision despatched
11.07.2005Request for further processing filed
11.07.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.07.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5382930  (STOKES ROBERT B [US], et al) [DA] 1,12,13,16,20,24 * column 4, line 12 - line 52; figure 3 *;
 [DA]  LAKIN K M ET AL, "Thin film bulk acoustic wave filters for GPS", IEEE 1992 ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM (CAT. NO.92CH3118-7), TUCSON, AZ, USA, 20-23 OCT. 1992, 1992, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-0562-0, pages 471 - 476 vol.1, XP002130402 [DA] 1,12,13,16,20,24 * page 471, column L, line 16 - column R, line 3 * * paragraph [00II] * * figure 1 *
 [DA]  DRISCOLL M M ET AL, "RECENT ADVANCES IN MONOLITHIC FILM RESONATOR TECHNOLOGY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1986), vol. -, pages 365 - 369, XP000647236 [DA] 1,12,13,16,20,24 * page 366, column R, line 30 - page 367, column R, line 9; figure 3 *
 [A]  KRISHNASWAMY S V, "FILM BULK ACOUSTIC WAVE RESONATOR AND FILTER TECHNOLOGY", INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST (MTT-S),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1992), vol. -, pages 153 - 155, XP000332705 [A] 1,12,13,16,20,24 * page 154, column L, line 64 - page 155, column L, line 22 *
Examination   LAKIN K M; KLINE G R; MCCARRON K T, "Development of miniature filters for wireless applications", MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, (19950516), pages 883 - 886, XP010612265

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSYM.1995.405906