Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0882793

EP0882793 - A human 7-tm receptor similar to murine frizzled-6 gene [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.10.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.12.2003  [2003/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia
Pennsylvania 19103 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/50]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hu, Erding
SmithKline Beecham Pharm., 709 Swedeland Road
King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
02 / Zhu, Yuan
SmithKline Beecham Pharm., 709 Swedeland Road
King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
[1998/50]
Representative(s)Crump, Julian Richard John , et al
Cleveland
40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/50]Crump, Julian Richard John , et al
FJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Application number, filing date98304208.628.05.1998
[1998/50]
Priority number, dateUS19970048240P02.06.1997         Original published format: US 48240 P
US1997098728909.12.1997         Original published format: US 987289
[1998/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0882793
Date:09.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0882793
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP02.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C12N15/85, C12N15/11, C12N5/10, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/68, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, A61K38/17, A61K48/00, G01N33/50
[1998/50]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2001/04]
Former [1998/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ein menschlicher 7-tm Rezeptor, der dem murinen frizzled-6 Gen ähnelt[2000/21]
English:A human 7-tm receptor similar to murine frizzled-6 gene[1998/50]
French:Recepteur 7-tm humain ressemblant au gene murin frizzled-6[2000/21]
Former [1998/50]Ein menschlicher 7-TM Rezeptor, der dem Murinen Frizzled-6 Gen ähnelt
Former [1998/50]Récepteur 7-TM humain ressemblant au gène murin frizzled-6
Examination procedure17.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
06.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/51]
21.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[T]WO9739357  (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [T] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [XD]  WANG Y ET AL, "A LARGE FAMILY OF PUTATIVE TRANSMEMBRANE RECEPTORS HOMOLOGOUS TO THE PRODUCT OF THE DROSOPHILA TISSUE POLARITY GENE FRIZZLED", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19960223), vol. 271, no. 8, pages 4468 - 4476, XP002054778 [XD] 1,3,5-7,10,12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.8.4468
    [] "AC U43319", EMBL DATABASE, Heidelberg, (19960113), [ ] * the whole document *
 [X]  HOANG B ET AL, "PRIMARY STRUCTURE AND TISSUE DISTRIBUTION OF FRZB, A NOVEL PROTEIN RELATED TO DROSOPHILA FRIZZLED, SUGGEST A ROLE IN SKELETAL MORPHOGENESIS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19961018), vol. 271, no. 42, pages 26131 - 26137, XP002054777 [X] 17,19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.42.26131
 [A]  HILLIER L. ET AL., "The WashU-Merck EST Project, AC AA064897", EMBL DATABASE, Heidelberg, (19960926), XP002074749 [A] 1-7,10-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  ADAMS M. ET AL., "AC AA385032", EMBL DATABASE, Heidelberg, (19970418), XP002074750 [A] 1-7,10-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  WANG Y K ET AL, "A novel human homologue of the Drosophila frizzled wnt receptor gene binds wingless protein and is in the Williams syndrome deletion at 7q11.23.", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (1997 MAR) 6 (3) 465-72. JOURNAL CODE: BRC. ISSN: 0964-6906., XP002074751 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [A]  HE X ET AL, "A member of the Frizzled protein family mediating axis induction by Wnt-5A.", SCIENCE, (1997 MAR 14) 275 (5306) 1652-4. JOURNAL CODE: UJ7. ISSN: 0036-8075., XP002074752 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [PX]  TOKUHARA M ET AL, "Molecular cloning of human Frizzled-6.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1998 FEB 13) 243 (2) 622-7. JOURNAL CODE: 9Y8. ISSN: 0006-291X., XP002074753 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document *