blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0968855

Designated contracting statesDE 
FR 
GB 
IT 
SE 
Examination procedure19.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT SE
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:30.08.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000703
 
Event date:13.09.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR GB IT SE
 
Event date:10.01.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20001121
 
Event date:17.04.2002 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20011012