Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968855

EP0968855 - Air conditioning apparatus for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2002
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.04.2002  [2002/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sanden Corporation
20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi
Gunma 372-8502 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Sanden Corporation
20 Kotobuki-cho
Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372-8502 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Inoue, Atsuo
c/o Sanden Corporation, 20 Kotobuki-cho
Isesaki-shi, gunma, 372-8502 / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2000/01]Jackson, Peter Arthur
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98304447.004.06.1998
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968855
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60H1/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugklimaanlage[2000/01]
English:Air conditioning apparatus for vehicle[2000/01]
French:Appareil de conditionnement pour véhicule[2000/01]
Examination procedure03.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
21.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/16]
19.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0872368  (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [E] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5170935  (FEDERSPIEL CLIFFORD C [US], et al) [Y] 1,8 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]EP0618098  (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [Y] 1,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH102594  ;
 [A]JPH05322258  ;
 [A]JPH0478709
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 098, no. 005, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940311), vol. 018, no. 147, Database accession no. (M - 1575), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920626), vol. 016, no. 290, Database accession no. (M - 1272), [A] 8 * abstract *