Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0885984

EP0885984 - Coated hard tool having multi-layer coating [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2003
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 07.12.2005  [2005/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/52]For all designated states
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hashimoto, Yasuhisa, c/o Sumimoto Elec. Ind., Ltd.
Itamo Works, 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
02 / Yamagata, Kazuo, c/o Sumimoto Elec. Ind., Ltd.
Itamo Works, 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
03 / Kitagawa, Nobuyuki, c/o Sumimoto Elec. Ind., Ltd.
Itamo Works, 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
[1998/52]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/52]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date98304460.305.06.1998
[1998/52]
Priority number, dateJP1997016215119.06.1997         Original published format: JP 16215197
[1998/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0885984
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0885984
Date:18.04.2001
[2001/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0885984
Date:31.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:C23C30/00, C23C14/06, C23C14/08, B23B27/14
[1998/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2002/02]
Former [1998/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hartes Werkzeug mit einer mehrschichtigen Beschichtung[1998/52]
English:Coated hard tool having multi-layer coating[1998/52]
French:Outil dur avec revêtement multicouche[1998/52]
Examination procedure11.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/24]
29.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
08.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2002Fee for grant paid
09.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR31.07.2002
[2005/49]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0709483  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4643951  (KEEM JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2048960  (KRUPP GMBH) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4554201  (ANDREEV ANATOLY A [SU], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *