Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0884099

EP0884099 - Gas generating apparatus and gas generation process using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.08.2001 [2001/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Air Water Inc.
2, Kita 3-jo Nishi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi
Hokkaido 060-0003 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
Air Water Inc.
2, Kita 3-jo Nishi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0003 / JP
Former [1998/51]For all designated states
DAIDO HOXAN INC.
2, Kita 3-jo Nishi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshino, Akira c/o Daido Hoxan, Inc
Sakai Plant 2-6-40, Chikko-Shinmachi Sakai-shi
Osaka 592 / JP
02 / Kiyama, Hiromi c/o Daido Hoxan, Inc
Sakai Plant 2-6-40, Chikko-Shinmachi Sakai-shi
Osaka 592 / JP
03 / Miyamoto, Atsushi c/o Daido Hoxan, Inc
Sakai Plant 2-6-40, Chikko-Shinmachi Sakai-shi
Osaka 592 / JP
04 / Kikuchi, Nobutaka c/o Daido Hoxan, Inc
Sakai Plant 2-6-40, Chikko-Shinmachi Sakai-shi
Osaka 592 / JP
[1998/51]
Representative(s)Frankland, Nigel Howard
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]Frankland, Nigel Howard
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date98304538.609.06.1998
[1998/51]
Priority number, dateJP1997015107309.06.1997         Original published format: JP 15107397
JP1997017065526.06.1997         Original published format: JP 17065597
[1998/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0884099
Date:16.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0884099
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B01J7/00, F01K11/02, F22B1/22, F02C3/00, F02C3/30, C01B3/36, C01B3/48
[2000/16]
Former International [1998/51]B01J7/00, F01K11/02, F22B1/22, F02C3/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/52]
Former [1998/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gasgenerator und seine Anwendung[1998/51]
English:Gas generating apparatus and gas generation process using the same[1998/51]
French:Générateur de gaz et son application[1998/51]
Examination procedure20.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/32]
12.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/32]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
27.11.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0009524  (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9606901  (STORK COMPRIMO BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5345756  (JAHNKE FREDERICK C [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [X]US4472936  (UCHIYAMA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4184322  (MCGANN RODNEY [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3868817  (MARION CHARLES P, et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [X]GB2237814  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1 * the whole document *