Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0885901

EP0885901 - Nucleic acid encoding Streptococcus pneumoniae response regulator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2002
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.04.2002  [2002/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia
Pennsylvania 19103 / US
For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC
New Horizons Court Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/52]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US
For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC
New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Wallis, Nicola G.
SmithKline Beecham Pharm., 709 Swedeland Road
King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
[1998/52]
Representative(s)Mallalieu, Catherine Louise , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/52]Mallalieu, Catherine Louise , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date98304562.609.06.1998
[1998/52]
Priority number, dateUS1997087413813.06.1997         Original published format: US 874138
[1998/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0885901
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0885901
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/31, C07K14/315, A61K39/085, C07K16/12, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50
[2000/03]
Former International [1998/52]C07K14/315, A61K39/085, C07K16/12, C12N15/31, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/39]
Former [1998/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nukleinsäure kodierend für Streptococcus pneumoniae Response-Regulator[1998/52]
English:Nucleic acid encoding Streptococcus pneumoniae response regulator[1998/52]
French:Acide nucléique codant pour Streptococcus pneumoniae régulateur de réponse[1998/52]
Examination procedure19.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
11.02.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9818931  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,7-11,13,15,17;
 [E]EP0913476  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [E] 1-20 * Please compare: SEQ ID NO:1 is identical to claimed SEQ ID NO:1 and codes for the polypeptide of claimed SEQ ID NO:2. *;
 [E]EP0892059  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * Please compare: SEQ ID NO:1 is identical to claimed SEQ ID NO:1 and codes for the polypeptide of claimed SEQ ID NO:2. *;
 [E]EP0885963  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * Please compare: SEQ ID NO:1 is identical to claimed SEQ ID NO:1 and codes for the polypeptide of claimed SEQ ID NO:2. *;
 [A]  SWANSON R.V. ET AL., "Histidine and aspartate phosphorylation: two-component systems and the limits of homology", TRENDS IN BIOCHEMICAL SCIENCES, (19941101), vol. 19, no. 11, pages 485 - 490, XP000646079 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0968-0004(94)90135-X