Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0893598

EP0893598 - Fuel system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
5725 Delphi Drive
Troy, MI 48098 / US
[2001/12]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Lucas Industries Limited
46 Park Street
London W1Y 4DJ / GB
Former [1999/04]For all designated states
LUCAS INDUSTRIES PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY
Stratford Road
Solihull B90 4LA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Cooke, Michael Peter
52 Burnt Oak Terrace
Gillingham, Kent ME7 1DR / GB
02 / Garland, Paul Francis
79 Cecil Road
Rochester, Gillingham, Kent, ME1 2HS / GB
03 / Stringfellow, Christopher
40 Merlin Close
Sittingbourne, Kent, ME10 4TY / GB
04 / Moore, Christopher Matthew
Woodmans, The Street
Boxley, Maidstone, Kent, ME14 3DY / GB
05 / Smith, Paul Raymond
6 Sheraton Court
Walderslade, Chatham, Kent, ME5 9EG / GB
[1999/04]
Representative(s)Keltie, David Arthur , et al
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Keltie, David Arthur , et al
Keltie Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
Former [2003/10]Keltie, David Arthur , et al
David Keltie Associates Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
Former [1999/04]Bailey, Richard Alan , et al
Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date98304730.916.06.1998
[1999/04]
Priority number, dateGB1997001573826.07.1997         Original published format: GB 9715738
GB1998001106323.05.1998         Original published format: GB 9811063
[1999/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0893598
Date:27.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0893598
Date:22.11.2000
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0893598
Date:28.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02M55/00, F02M63/02, F04F5/46
[2000/46]
Former International [1999/04]F02M63/02, F02M55/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/32]
Former [1999/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kraftstoffsystem[1999/04]
English:Fuel system[1999/04]
French:Système de combustible[1999/04]
Examination procedure10.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
25.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2003Fee for grant paid
20.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT28.05.2003
GB28.08.2003
ES08.09.2003
[2008/15]
Former [2004/45]GB28.08.2003
ES08.09.2003
Former [2004/03]ES08.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0408915  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-4,6 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 25; figure . *;
 [A]US4719889  (AMANN GERNOT [AT], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 10; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH08218967  ;
 [A]DE4333612  (GABELGAARD KELD [DE]) [A] 7 * column 5, line 2 - column 6, line 21; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, [A] 1,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - T. RAKOCZY, V.D.I ZEITSCHRIFT, Köln, (19710901), vol. VDI-Z, no. 113, pages 1007 - 1010, XP002148037 [A] 7 * page 1008, column 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4; figure 2 *