Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0892410

EP0892410 - Improved thick film resistor assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2002
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.08.2002  [2002/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Welwyn Components Limited
Welwyn Electronics Park Bedlington
Northumberland NE22 7AA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]For all designated states
Welwyn Components Limited
Welwyn Electronics Park
Bedlington, Northumberland NE22 7AA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Morris, Thomas M.
c/o Welwyn Components Ltd., Welwyn Elec. Park
Bedlington, Northumberland NE22 7AA / GB
[1999/03]
Representative(s)Shaya, Darrin Maurice
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]Shaya, Darrin Maurice
Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date98304740.816.06.1998
[1999/03]
Priority number, dateUS1997087927020.06.1997         Original published format: US 879270
[1999/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0892410
Date:20.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0892410
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01C7/00, H01C17/065, B60H1/00, H01C1/084
[2000/05]
Former International [1999/03]H01C7/00, H01C17/065, B60H1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/41]
Former [1999/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbesserte Dickschichtwiderstandsanordnung[1999/03]
English:Improved thick film resistor assembly[1999/03]
French:Assemblage amélioré de résistance à film épais[1999/03]
Examination procedure31.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
19.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/33]
06.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[YA]GB2202382  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [Y] 1,9,14,15,19 * page 2, line 30 - page 4, line 17; figures 1-3; claims 1,2,8-10 * [A] 16;
 [DYA]US5181313  (NONNENMACHER RONALD C [US], et al) [DY] 1,9,14,15,19 * the whole document * [A] 5-7,10,11,16,18,20;
 [DYA]US3895272  (SMOLKO GENNADY GRIGORIEVICH, et al) [DY] 1,9,14,15,19 * column 2, line 7 - column 2, line 51; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [A] 12,13;
 [DA]US5408575  (MORRIS THOMAS M [US]) [DA] 1,8,12-15,18,19 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4404237  (EICHELBERGER CHARLES W [US], et al) [DA] 1-4
by applicantUS5000662
 US5192940
 US5274351
 US5291174
 US5408575
 US4935717
 US5119063
 US5181313
 US2179566
 US3895272
 US4119937
 US4138636
 US4404237
 US4912306
 US5035836
 US5038132
    tool and manufacturing engineers handbook, society of manufacturing engineers, 3rd edition, pages 25 - 44,
    general motors part no. 1995318,