Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0903644

EP0903644 - Electrophotographic imaging apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.01.2005  [2005/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lexmark International, Inc.
740 New Circle Road N.W.
Lexington, Kentucky 40550 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/12]For all designated states
Lexmark International, Inc.
740 New Circle Road N.W.
Lexington, Kentucky 40550 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Curry, Steven Alan
197 Bent Tree Court
Nicholasville, Kentucky 40356 / US
02 / Horrall, Paul Douglas
1551 Beacon Hill Road
Lexington, Kentucky 40504 / US
03 / Merrifield, David Lee
661 Wellington Way
Lexington, Kentucky 40503 / US
04 / Mlejnek, Daniel George
1432 Glenview Drive
Lexington, Kentucky 40514 / US
05 / Molloy, James John
345 Fox Harbour Drive
Lexington, Kentucky 40517 / US
06 / Portig, Harold
400 Tincher Drive
Versailles, Kentucky 40383 / US
07 / Ream, Gregory Lawrence
2220 Abbeywood Road
Lexington, Kentucky 40515 / US
08 / Seman, Richard Andrew, Jr.
1260 Colorado Road
Lexington, Kentucky 40509 / US
[1999/12]
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/30]Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [1999/12]Leale, Robin George
Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date98304981.824.06.1998
[1999/12]
Priority number, dateUS19970051041P27.06.1997         Original published format: US 51041 P
US1998002572318.02.1998         Original published format: US 25723
[1999/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0903644
Date:24.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0903644
Date:26.07.2000
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0903644
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/08, G03G15/00
[2000/30]
Former International [1999/12]G03G15/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/14]
Former [1999/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrophotographisches Abbildungsgerät[1999/12]
English:Electrophotographic imaging apparatus[1999/12]
French:Appareil électrophotographique de formation d'images[2003/34]
Former [1999/12]Appareil electrophotographique d'imagerie
Examination procedure22.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
28.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2003Fee for grant paid
10.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH06241251  ;
 [XA]JPS6334327  ;
 [YA]US5303004  (MARUYAMA HIROYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * column W * [A] 1,5;
 [YA]US3727732  (BARR W) [Y] 2 * column W * [A] 3;
 [A]US3837441  (UNO N, et al) [A] 2 * abstract *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941130), vol. 018, no. 628, Database accession no. (M - 1713), [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * [A] 2-4
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880713), vol. 012, no. 247, Database accession no. (M - 717), [X] 1,5 * abstract * [A] 2-4
ExaminationJPH06241251