Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0889412

EP0889412 - Split write data processing mechanism for memory controllers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.08.2006
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
4150 Network Circle
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/40]For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
4150 Network Circle Santa Clara
California 95054 / US
Former [2003/17]For all designated states
Sun Microsystems, Inc.
4150 Network Circle
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
Sun Microsystems, Inc.
901 San Antonio Road
Palo Alto, California 94303-4900 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Webber, Thomas P.
21 South Main Street
Petersham, Massachusetts 01366 / US
02 / Joshi, Ketan P.
38833 Bell Street, Apt. No. 200
Fremont, California 94536 / US
 [2005/39]
Former [1999/01]01 / Webber, Thomas P.
21 South Main Street
Petersham, Massachusetts 01366 / US
02 / Joshi, Ketan P.
38833 Bell Street, Apt. No. 200
Freemont, California 94536 / US
Representative(s)Harris, Ian Richard , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Harris, Ian Richard , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date98305090.729.06.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, dateUS1997088484430.06.1997         Original published format: US 884844
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0889412
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0889412
Date:12.12.2001
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0889412
Date:05.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/16
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2002/36]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verarbeitungsvorrichtung für zerteilte Schreibdaten in Speichersteuerungseinheiten[1999/01]
English:Split write data processing mechanism for memory controllers[1999/01]
French:Dispositif de traitement de données d'écriture fractionnées pour des unités de commande de mémoire[1999/01]
Examination procedure16.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/29]
08.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2005Fee for grant paid
29.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR05.10.2005
IT05.10.2005
NL05.10.2005
SE05.01.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/15]IT05.10.2005
NL05.10.2005
SE05.01.2006
Former [2006/27]NL05.10.2005
SE05.01.2006
Former [2006/22]NL05.10.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US5455924  (SHENOY SUNIL R [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 1, line 60 - line 66 * * column 2, line 12 - line 26 * * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 38 * * column 5, line 9 - line 39 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 9 * * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 50; figure 6 *;
 [A]US5625778  (CHILDERS BRIAN A [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 1, line 27 - line 35; figure 2 * * column 2, line 2 - line 22 * * column 2, line 49 - line 63 * * column 3, line 1 - line 8 *