Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0889441

EP0889441 - Lighting unit and method for a three-dimensional graphics accelerator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/01]Lighting unit for a three-dimensional graphics accelerator
[2003/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
4150 Network Circle
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/17]For all designated states
Sun Microsystems, Inc.
4150 Network Circle
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
Sun Microsystems, Inc.
901 San Antonio Road
Palo Alto, California 94303-4900 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Deering, Michael F.
657 Cuesta Drive
Los Altos, California 94024 / US
02 / Morse, Wayne
33308 Jamie Circle
Fremont, California 94555 / US
03 / Nelson, Scott R.
4429 Clovewood Lane
Pleasanton, California 94588 / US
04 / Rushforth, Kevin
3314 Fawn Drive
San Jose, California 95124 / US
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Harris, Ian Richard , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Harris, Ian Richard , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date98305094.929.06.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, dateUS1997088468830.06.1997         Original published format: US 884688
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0889441
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0889441
Date:03.05.2000
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0889441
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06T15/50
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/02]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Beleuchtungsberechnungseinheit und Verfahren für dreidimensionalen Graphikbeschleuniger[2003/10]
English:Lighting unit and method for a three-dimensional graphics accelerator[2003/10]
French:Unité et méthode de calcul d'éclairage pour un accélérateur graphique tri-dimensionnel[2003/10]
Former [1999/01]Beleuchtungseinheit für dreidimensionalen Graphikbeschleuniger
Former [1999/01]Lighting unit for a three-dimensional graphics accelerator
Former [1999/01]Unité d'éclairage pour un accélérateur graphique tri-dimensionnel
Examination procedure09.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
14.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2003Fee for grant paid
23.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
SE10.12.2003
[2008/15]
Former [2004/16]NL10.09.2003
SE10.12.2003
Former [2004/13]NL10.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4901064  (DEERING MICHAEL F [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,8,14,15,17,18,26 * abstract * * column 3, line 57 - column 6, line 66 * * column 9, line 35 - column 10, line 20 * * column 13, line 35 - column 14, line 44 *;
 [Y]EP0590994  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,8,14,15,17,18,26 * abstract * * column 5, line 19 - line 41 * * column 9, line 38 - line 46 * * column 21, line 25 - line 54 *;
 [A]US4694404  (MEAGHER DONALD J R [US]) [A] 1,2,9,14,15,22,26 * column 105, line 33 - column 106, line 35; figure 45 *;
 [A]EP0447226  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-26 * figure 3 * * page 4, line 21 - line 26 * * page 6, line 36 - line 41 *;
 [E]US5956042  (TUCKER S PAUL [US], et al) [E] 1-26 * column 5, line 38 - line 58; table 1 *;
 [A]EP0666548  (IBM [US])