Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0889387

EP0889387 - Controlling a power state of a computer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.04.2004  [2004/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Compaq Computer Corporation
20555 S.H. 249 Houston
Texas 77070 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
Compaq Computer Corporation
20555 S.H. 249
Houston Texas 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Taylor, Mark E.
9019 Rhapsody Lane
Houston, Texas 77040 / US
02 / Kunkel, Larry W.
4823 Marburg Court
Houston, Texas 77066 / US
03 / Bayramoglu, Gokalp
10415 Rippling Fields Drive
Houston, Texas 77064 / US
04 / D'Souza, Henry M.
11407 Willow Field
Cypress, Texas 77429 / US
05 / Ali, Valiuddin
6830 Champions Plaza Drive, No. 619
Houston, Texas 77069 / US
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Brunner, Michael John
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Brunner, Michael John
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98305147.529.06.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, dateUS1997088470930.06.1997         Original published format: US 884709
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0889387
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0889387
Date:14.06.2000
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0889387
Date:07.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/26, G06F1/32, G06F1/16
[2000/24]
Former International [1999/01]G06F1/26
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/08]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Steuerung des Leistungszustandes eines Rechners[1999/01]
English:Controlling a power state of a computer[1999/01]
French:Commande d'un état d'alimentation d'un ordinateur[1999/01]
Examination procedure24.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
29.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.2002Fee for grant paid
18.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0319272  (PACESETTER INFUSION LTD) [X] 1-6,13,17,20,23 * page 4, line 57 - page 5, line 4 * * page 7, line 6 - line 1 * * page 7, line 25 - line 36 * * page 8, line 11 - line 22 * * page 19, line 45 - line 51 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO9429783  (VOBIS MICROCOMPUTER AG ;DAHMEN HEINZ WILLI (DE)) [X] 1-6,13,17,20,23 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 4 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [E]EP0901062  (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP) [E] 1,2,12-14,20 * abstract * * page 6, line 30 - line 34 * * page 6, line 43 - line 46 * * page 7, paragraph 1 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0701194  (IBM) [A] 1,2,20 * column W *
 [X]  - "CONTROL PANEL FOR MODELS OF AS/400", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19900201), vol. 32, no. 9B, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 125 - 129, XP000082263 [X] 1,2,20 * the whole document *