Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0888908

EP0888908 - Decorative wooden material coated with resin composite film and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.07.2006
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tohcello Co., Ltd.
3-3, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
Tohcello Co., Ltd.
3-3, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Katagiri, Mikio
c/o Tohcello Co., Ltd., 3-3, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [1999/01]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98305198.830.06.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, dateJP1997017456730.06.1997         Original published format: JP 17456797
JP1998014003521.05.1998         Original published format: JP 14003598
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0888908
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0888908
Date:07.02.2001
[2001/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0888908
Date:07.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:B44C5/04, B27D1/00, B32B31/00, B29C63/02
[2001/05]
Former International [1999/01]B44C5/04, B27D1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/43]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dekoratives Material aus Holz mit Beschichtung aus Harzfolie und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[1999/01]
English:Decorative wooden material coated with resin composite film and process for producing the same[1999/01]
French:Matériau décoratif en bois revêtu d'un film en résine et procédé pour sa fabrication[1999/01]
Examination procedure05.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/36]
29.01.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2005Fee for grant paid
14.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4743509  (VLADIMIRO KOKRHANEK [IT]) [Y] 1-10 * column 5, line 12 - line 36; figures 1-3; claims 18-20 *;
 [Y]US4337107  (ESHLEMAN RONALD J) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 20 - line 45; figure 1; claims 1,13 *;
 [Y]EP0397425  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * column 6, line 16 - column 7, line 11; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH0577591  ;
 [A]JPH07276311
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 17, Database accession no. 1993-140121, XP002154986 & JPH0577591 A 19930330 (MITSUI DUPONT) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07276311 A 19951024 (NODA) [A] 1 * abstract *