Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0888963

EP0888963 - Sailing harness [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.06.2003  [2003/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEIL PRYDE LIMITED
16th Floor Tins Centre, Stage 3 3 Hung Cheung Road Tuen Mun
New Territories, Hong Kong / CN
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
NEIL PRYDE LIMITED
16th Floor Tins Centre, Stage 3 3 Hung Cheung Road Tuen Mun
New Territories Hong Kong / HK
Inventor(s)01 / Janse van Rensburg, Moorrees, c/o Neil Pryde LT
16 Floor, Tins Centre,Stage 3, 3 Hung Cheung Road
Tuen Mun, New Terr., Hong Kong / HK
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Godwin, Edgar James , et al
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]Godwin, Edgar James , et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Former [1999/01]Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date98305264.802.07.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, dateDE1997211757U04.07.1997         Original published format: DE 29711757 U
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0888963
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0888963
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B63H9/10, A62B35/00, // B63B35/79, A62B35/00
[2000/01]
Former International [1999/01]B63H9/10, // B63B35/79, A62B35/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/37]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Trapez für das Segeln[1999/01]
English:Sailing harness[1999/01]
French:Harnais pour la voile[1999/01]
Examination procedure12.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/27]
06.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
04.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2601879  (LOOK SA [FR]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3838577  (JUNG) [A] 1 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 25; figure 1 *;
 [A]CH683204  (GUDO AG) [A] 3,4 * column A; figures 1-7 *