Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968914

EP0968914 - Device for and method of applying work to internal surfaces of a vessel hold [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.05.2004  [2004/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
METRO MACHINE CORPORATION
Imperial Docks, Foot of Ligon Street Norfolk
Virginia 23501 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
METRO MACHINE CORPORATION
Imperial Docks, Foot of Ligon Street
Norfolk, Virginia 23501 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Goldbach, Richard A.
Foot of Ligon Street
Norfolk, Virginia 23523 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Laight, Martin Harvey , et al
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Laight, Martin Harvey , et al
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date98305306.703.07.1998
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968914
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968914
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:B63C5/02, B63B59/06
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gerät und Verfahren zum Bearbeiten von Innenoberflächen eines Schiffsladeraumes[2000/01]
English:Device for and method of applying work to internal surfaces of a vessel hold[2000/01]
French:Dispositif et méthode pour travailler les surfaces intérieures des cales d'un bateau[2000/01]
Examination procedure23.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
22.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2003Fee for grant paid
11.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19]
Request for further processing for:21.05.2002Request for further processing filed
21.05.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.06.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3891051  (TAKENOUCHI SENJI, et al) [Y] 1,3,7,10-14,18,19 * column 3, line 61 - column 6, line 7; figures 1-12 *;
 [Y]GB1382112  (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [Y] 1,3,7,10-14,18,19 * page 3, line 4 - line 75; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]GB1151793  (CAMMELL LAIRD SHIPREPAIRERS LT) [A] 1,5,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3753413  (MATSUHIRO K, et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2313135  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1,15-17 * page 6, line 10 - line 20; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2500660  (CHAPPEN STEPHEN P) [A] 1,10-15 * column W *;
 [AD]US5353729  (GOLDBACH RICHARD A [US], et al) [AD] 1,2,4-6 * column 9, line 48 - line 63; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]NL9101910  (LTC INT BV) [A] 1,5,8,17 * abstract *;
 [A]US4057943  (LIENHARD ROBERT W) [A] 2 * abstract *
by applicantUS5398632
 US5353729
 US5540172