Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970811

EP0970811 - Automatic painting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2006
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.08.2006  [2006/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L.A.C. Corporation
800-5, Oyama-machi Machida-shi
Tokyo 194-0212 / JP
[2005/38]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
L.A.C. Corporation
800-5, Oyama-machi
Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-0212 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kaiba, Tadashi
800-5 Oyama-machi
Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-0212 / JP
02 / Murai, Syusei
800-5 Oyama-machi
Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-0212 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date98305363.806.07.1998
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970811
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970811
Date:21.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/01
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Automatische Beschichtungsvorrichtung[2000/02]
English:Automatic painting device[2000/02]
French:Dispositif automatique de peinture[2000/02]
Examination procedure24.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
16.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2005Fee for grant paid
09.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
21.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
19.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE21.12.2005
[2006/13]
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0333609  (LAPIERRE GILLES H) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0317219  (LAC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5240745  (YAMAMOTO TOHRU [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH09206641  ;
 [A]JPH0857373  ;
 [A]JPH07265755  ;
 [A]US4743819  (HASHIZUME JUNJI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4357900  (BUSCHOR KARL) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4209279  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4864966  (ANDERSON G SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 097, no. 012, [A] 1-3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 096, no. 007, [A] 1-3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 096, no. 002, [A] 1-3 * abstract *