blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0971087 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0971087



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 74
13.07.2006 Closing of application Search / examination 1
17.03.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
02.09.2005 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
30.07.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
30.07.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
28.04.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
07.04.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
07.04.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.12.2003 Description Search / examination 1
05.12.2003 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.12.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.11.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.08.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
05.08.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.10.2000 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
08.08.2000 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
24.06.2000 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.06.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
02.03.2000 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.03.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
28.12.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.12.1998 European search report Search / examination 1
07.07.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.07.1998 Claims Search / examination 4
07.07.1998 Description Search / examination 12
07.07.1998 Drawings Search / examination 10
07.07.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.07.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6