blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0971087


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.07.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  16.08.2006  [2006/33]
11.03.2006 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.08.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
13.08.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.04.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.04.2004 Deletion: Reply to examination report
20.12.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.08.2003 First examination report
01.08.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.07.2002 Renewal fee
28.06.2001 Renewal fee
26.02.2001 Loss of particular rights
18.10.2000 Loss of particular rights
02.10.2000 Change - extension states
04.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
03.08.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
28.07.2000 Renewal fee
30.06.2000 Request for examination filed published on  16.08.2000 [2000/33]
26.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]