Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971087

EP0971087 - Padlock [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.07.2006
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.08.2006  [2006/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chen, Waterson
8F, No. 428 Wu-Chuan-Nan Road
Taichung City / TW
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date98305394.307.07.1998
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971087
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:E05B67/24, E05B9/08
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorhängeschloss[2000/02]
English:Padlock[2000/02]
French:Cadenas[2000/02]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
13.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY
05.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/33]
17.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2141748  (HENRY HANSEN) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4;
 [Y]GB2224071  (ROWLANDS TEENA JANE) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 10 *;
 [Y]US2460615  (ANDREW JOHN P) [Y] 4 * figures 2,4,5 *;
 [A]US3172279  (PATRIQUIN GEORGE P) [A] 1,4 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4545223  (POUTIAINEN HEIKKI [FI], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, lines 44-58 *;
 [A]DE2741718  (MRT MAGNET REGELTECHNIK GMBH) [A] 3 * page 3, paragraph 1 *