Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0890781

EP0890781 - Gas turbine lubrication during starting [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.03.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.03.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.04.2006  [2006/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolls-Royce plc
65 Buckingham Gate
London, SW1E 6AT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/02]For all designated states
ROLLS-ROYCE plc
65 Buckingham Gate
London, SW1E 6AT / GB
Inventor(s)01 / White, Cyril Mark
396 Mulberry Street
Plantsville, Connecticut 06479 / US
[1999/02]
Application number, filing date98305433.908.07.1998
[1999/02]
Priority number, dateUS1997089150011.07.1997         Original published format: US 891500
[1999/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0890781
Date:13.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0890781
Date:19.07.2000
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0890781
Date:04.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16N29/02, F02C7/27, F01D25/18
[1999/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/13]
Former [1999/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schmierung einer Gasturbine während des Starts[1999/02]
English:Gas turbine lubrication during starting[1999/02]
French:Lubrification d'une turbine à gaz pendant son démarrage[1999/02]
Examination procedure21.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
26.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2005Fee for grant paid
22.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17]
Request for further processing for:07.11.2003Request for further processing filed
07.11.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.12.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
17.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
16.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]DE849043  (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [X] 1-4,8 * page 2, line 36 - line 42 * * page 2, line 60 - line 65; figure . * * page 2, line 79 - line 83 *;
 [X]US2761281  (CYRIL ARMER) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 9 - line 45; figure 1 *;
 [X]DE4445957  (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 31 - line 35; figure - *;
 [A]US5494013  (HELBIG JIM D [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]US5494012  (HAGEN TERRY L [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]US5348121  (MCLAUGHLIN NORMAN L [US])