Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0891020

EP0891020 - Brush assembly for dynamoelectric machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark, DE 19711 / US
[2006/16]
Former [1999/02]For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark Delaware 19711 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bohart, Russell J.
5-B Arlen Road
Baltimore, Maryland 21236 / US
02 / Wheeler, Dale K.
1119 Sturbridge Road
Fallston, Maryland 21047 / US
[1999/02]
Representative(s)Dlugosz, Anthony Charles , et al
Black & Decker Europe
European Group Headquarters
210 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/05]Dlugosz, Anthony Charles , et al
Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
Former [1999/02]Stagg, Diana Christine , et al
Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road
Birmingham B42 1BP / GB
Application number, filing date98305440.408.07.1998
[1999/02]
Priority number, dateUS1997089117910.07.1997         Original published format: US 891179
[1999/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0891020
Date:13.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0891020
Date:19.07.2000
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0891020
Date:19.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R39/38, H01R39/26, H02K5/14
[2000/29]
Former International [1999/02]H01R39/38, H01R39/26
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2001/13]
Former [1999/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bürstenanordnung für eine dynamoelektrische Maschine[1999/02]
English:Brush assembly for dynamoelectric machine[1999/02]
French:Ensemble balai pour maschine dynamoélectrique[1999/02]
Examination procedure17.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
24.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2006Fee for grant paid
10.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH19.04.2006
LI19.04.2006
[2007/03]
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3784856  (PRESTON C) [Y] 1,4 * column 4, line 15 - line 23; figures 3,4 *;
 [Y]US1934350  (HARTMAN HARRY F) [Y] 1,4 * page 1, line 71 - line 82; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2104721  (BERGER CLARENCE E) [A] 2 * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2297505  (ACEC [BE]) [A] 1,4 * page 2, line 20 - line 32; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS60219941  ;
 [A]US4593220  (COUSINS WALTER K [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 6, line 58 - line 60; figure 3 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860318), vol. 010, no. 069, Database accession no. (E - 389), [A] 1,4 * abstract *