Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971572

EP0971572 - An assembly comprising two components and a mechanism for fastening them together [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.08.2000
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2000Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.09.2000 [2000/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reddicliffe, Edward A.
Coxhill, Boldre
Lymington, Hants SO41 8PS / GB
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2000/02]Jackson, Peter Arthur
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98305486.710.07.1998
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971572
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/18, F16B5/06
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Befestigungmechanismus für eine Zweikomponentige Vorrichtung[2000/02]
English:An assembly comprising two components and a mechanism for fastening them together[2000/02]
French:Dispositif comprenant deux éléments et un mécanisme pour les fixer ensemble[2000/02]
Examination procedure11.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
26.07.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US5052565  (ZACHREI JURGEN [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 5 - column 3, line 13; figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2723620  (VYNEX SA [FR]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-2C *;
 [A]EP0261083  (SMEG SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 47 - column 4, line 56; figures 1,2,5-7 *;
 [A]FR2668214  (NIFCO INC [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *