blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0891835

EP0891835 - Method for attaching electronic components to substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/03]Method and apparatus for attaching electronic components to substrates
[2003/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 10.11.2004  [2004/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FORD MOTOR COMPANY
The American Road
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]For all designated states
Ford Motor Company
The American Road
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Meyer, Bernard A.
25000 Pamela
Taylor, Michigan 48180 / US
02 / Kneisel, Lawrence L.
44676 Midway Drive
Novi, Michigan 48375 / US
03 / Baker, Jay D.
4210 Hardwoods Drive
W. Bloomfield, Michigan 48323 / US
04 / Achari, Achyuta
44821 Danbury Road
Canton, Michigan 48188 / US
05 / Jairazbhoy, Vivek Amir
31122 Pine Cone Drive
Farmington Hills, Michigan 48331 / US
[1999/03]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]Messulam, Alec Moses
A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway
Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date98305540.110.07.1998
[1999/03]
Priority number, dateUS1997089191214.07.1997         Original published format: US 891912
[1999/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0891835
Date:20.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0891835
Date:21.07.1999
[1999/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0891835
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.1999
ClassificationIPC:B23K1/005
[1999/03]
CPC:
B23K3/0607 (EP); B23K1/0056 (EP); B23K1/20 (EP);
H05K3/3494 (EP); H05K2203/107 (EP); H05K3/3457 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   PT [2000/13]
Former [1999/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Verbinden von elektronischen Bauelementen auf einem Substrat[2003/04]
English:Method for attaching electronic components to substrates[2003/04]
French:Méthode pour connecter des composants électroniques sur un substrat[2003/04]
Former [1999/03]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von elektronischen Bauelementen auf einem Substrat
Former [1999/03]Method and apparatus for attaching electronic components to substrates
Former [1999/03]Méthode et appareil pour connecter des composants électroniques sur un substrat
Examination procedure24.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
30.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2003Fee for grant paid
07.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipPT16.12.2003
ES21.12.2003
[2004/46]
Former [2004/31]PT16.12.2003
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5506385  (MURAKAMI ET AL.) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * abstract;; figure 25 * [Y] 6;
 [Y]US5175410  (FREEDMAN ET AL.) [Y] 6 * column 8, paragraph 5; figure 5 *;
 [A]US5023426  (PROKOSCH ET AL.) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 46; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.