Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973264

EP0973264 - Decoding chip streams [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/37]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Beale, Martin Warwick
49 Goodeve Park, Hazelwood Road
Sneyd Park, Bristol BS9 1QF / GB
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Lawrence, Richard Anthony
Hewlett-Packard Limited, IP Section, Building 3, Filton Road Stoke Gifford
Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/24]Lawrence, Richard Anthony
Hewlett-Packard Limited, IP Section, Building 3, Filton Road Stoke Gifford
Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
Former [2000/03]Coker, David Graeme
Hewlett-Packard Limited Intellectual Property Section Building 2 Filton Road
Stoke Gifford, Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
Application number, filing date98305567.413.07.1998
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973264
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973264
Date:13.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:H03M5/04, H04B1/707
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Chipströmedekodierung[2000/03]
English:Decoding chip streams[2000/03]
French:Décodage de flux de cadenses (chip)[2000/03]
Examination procedure25.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
14.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2006Fee for grant paid
12.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR13.09.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/23]FR18.05.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0400314  (NEILL COMMUNICATIONS INC O [US]) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5093841  (VANCRAEYNEST JAN P [US]) [A] 1,12 * column W *;
 [A]US5077753  (GRAU JR JUAN [US], et al);
 [A]WO9708861  (TERAYON CORP [US]);
 [A]US4930139  (CHANDLER DONALD G [US], et al);
 [A]US5319735  (PREUSS ROBERT D [US], et al)
 [A]  CHIEN C ET AL, "A SINGLE-CHIP 12.7 MCHIPS/S DIGITAL IF BPSK DIRECT SEQUENCE SPREAD -SPECTRUM TRANSCEIVER IN 1.2 PM CMOS", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (19941201), vol. 29, no. 12, pages 1614 - 1623, XP000495341

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.340439