Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972542

EP0972542 - Building emergency evacuation device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.05.2003
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.06.2003  [2003/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lin, Cheng-Hsin
No. 1 Lane 193, Industry Road
Taichung Hsien / TW
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Gee, Steven William
D.W. & S.W. GEE
1 South Lynn Gardens
London Road
Shipston on Stour, Warwickshire CV36 4ER / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Gee, Steven William
1 South Lynn Gardens, London Road
Shipston on Stour, Warwickshire CV36 4ER / GB
Application number, filing date98305569.014.07.1998
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972542
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A62B1/20
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesAL05.08.1998
LT05.08.1998
LV05.08.1998
RO05.08.1998
SI05.08.1998
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Notevakuierung eines Gebäudes[2000/03]
English:Building emergency evacuation device[2000/03]
French:Dispotif d'evacuation d'urgence d'un edifice[2000/03]
Examination procedure31.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
19.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, IE, SE
28.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
11.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
17.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2001
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2101054  (KINNEAR JOHN MORRIS) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * page 1, line 47 - page 2, line 28; figure - *;
 [X]DE2621135  (BORGER MATTHIAS J H) [X] 1,4 * page 3, line 5 - page 5, line 28; figure - *;
 [X]DE3504153  (BAUR HANS JOERG) [X] 1 * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 31; figure - *;
 [A]US3083015  (BARENHOLTZ BERNARD M, et al) [A] 1,2,5-7 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 65; figure - *