Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977308

EP0977308 - Tensioned cord attachement of antenna reflector to inflated support structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 13.04.2005  [2005/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HARRIS CORPORATION
1025 West NASA Blvd MS 53
Melbourne, FL 32919 / US
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Bibb, Allen
1050 Sunswept Road, NE
Palm Bay, Florida 32905 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert
30 The Green Calne
Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert
23, Centre Heights
London NW3 6JG / GB
Application number, filing date98305677.116.07.1998
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977308
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01Q15/16, H01Q1/42, H01Q3/16
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/41]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gespannte Seilbefestigung eines Antennenreflektors mit einer aufblasbaren Struktur[2000/05]
English:Tensioned cord attachement of antenna reflector to inflated support structure[2000/05]
French:Fixation de corde en tension d'un réflecteur d'antenne avec une structure gonflable[2000/05]
Examination procedure02.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
11.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]GB838250  (NAT RES DEV) [X] 1-14 * page 1, line 53 - page 2, line 91; figures 1,2; claims 1-6 *;
 [X]DD291880  (USTINOW NIKOLAI [DE]) [X] 1-14 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 26; figures 1,4,5; claims 1-5 *;
 [X]CH685080  (CONTRAVES AG) [X] 1-14 * page 2, column 1, line 56 - page 3, column 1, line 2; figures 1,2; claims 1-6 * * abstract *;
 [X]GB758090  (SUCAL LTD, et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-12,14 * page 1, line 75 - page 2, line 42; figure 1; claims 1-5,19,20 *;
 SU1259919  [ ] (BASILAYA I SH);
 [X]WO9109434  (BACO IND AS [NO]) [X] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [AD]US4364053  (HOTINE WILLIAM) [AD] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [AD]US4755819  (BERNASCONI MARCO C [CH], et al) [AD] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [E]GB2328560  (HARRIS CORP [US]) [E] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Mirror-type aerial reflector - has assembly of trapezoidal strips made from metal rape for reflection surface", DATABASE WPI, DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., LONDON, GB, (1987), XP002105014 [X] 1-14 * abstract *