blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0893237

EP0893237 - Segmented toroidal core for manufacturing pneumatic tires [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/04]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ogawa, Yuichiro
15-1, Katamachi 2-Chome
Fuchu City, Tokyo / JP
[1999/04]
Representative(s)Whalley, Kevin
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/04]Whalley, Kevin
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date98305859.522.07.1998
[1999/04]
Priority number, dateJP1997021129122.07.1997         Original published format: JP 21129197
JP1997022755308.08.1997         Original published format: JP 22755397
[1999/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0893237
Date:27.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0893237
Date:15.12.1999
[1999/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0893237
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:B29D30/12, B29D30/06
[1999/04]
CPC:
B29D30/0661 (EP,US); B29D30/12 (EP,US); B29C35/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2000/34]
Former [1999/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ein torusförmiger segmentierter Kern zur Herstellung von Luftreifen[1999/04]
English:Segmented toroidal core for manufacturing pneumatic tires[1999/04]
French:Noyau toroidal segmenté pour la fabrication de pneumatiques[1999/04]
Examination procedure12.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/11]
19.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2003Fee for grant paid
06.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US1551014  (DOAK ERNEST W) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document *;
 [X]US1903458  (JOHNSON FRANK L) [X] 1,3,5 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4083672  (VAISHNAV DOLAR HARSHADRAI) [X] 1 * column 1, line 61 - column 3, line 6; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US4248287  (CHRISTMAN HAROLD E) [X] 1,5,6,8 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 34; figures 3-6 *;
 [A]EP0481805  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4,7,8* column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 6; figures 1,2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.