Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0893776

EP0893776 - A data card connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.2007
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.08.2007  [2007/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [1999/04]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Haffenden, Ian
42 Beauclerk Green
Winchfield, Surrey RG27 8BF / GB
02 / Smith, David
41 Mitchan Road
Camberley, Surrey GU15 4AR / GB
 [2006/34]
Former [1999/04]01 / Haffender, Ian
42 Beauclerk Green
Winchfield, Surrey RG27 8BF / GB
02 / Smith, David
41 Mitchan Road
Camberley, Surrey GU15 4AR / GB
Representative(s)Higgin, Paul , et al
Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/25]Higgin, Paul , et al
Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Former [1999/04]Jeffery, Kendra Louise
Nokia Mobile Phones (UK) Ltd. St. Georges Court St. Georges Road
Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB
Application number, filing date98305871.023.07.1998
[1999/04]
Priority number, dateGB1997001580825.07.1997         Original published format: GB 9715808
[1999/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0893776
Date:27.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0893776
Date:13.09.2000
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0893776
Date:23.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/00
[1999/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   SE [2001/22]
Former [1999/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ein Datenkartensteckverbinder[1999/04]
English:A data card connector[1999/04]
French:Connecteur pour carte de données[1999/04]
Examination procedure13.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
21.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2006Fee for grant paid
07.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE23.11.2006
ES04.12.2006
[2007/17]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0247368  (ALLIED CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 12 *;
 [A]FR2627880  (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *