Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977159

EP0977159 - Electronic terminal apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.04.2004  [2004/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Computer Products (Europe) S.A.S.
Parc de Limere Zone Industrielle Ardon
45160 Olivet / FR
[2003/22]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Hitachi Computer Products (Europe) S.A.
Parc de Limere, Zone Industrielle, BP 629
45166 Olivet Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Nakabayashi, Kazuyoshi
59 rue de la Motte
45590 St Cyr en Val / FR
02 / Guinoiseau, Romuald
15 passage des noisetiers
45750 St Pryve St Mesmin / FR
03 / Parisot, Didier
21 rue de la Guillaumiere
45140 St Jean de la Ruelle / FR
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date98305968.427.07.1998
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977159
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977159
Date:07.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/10, G06K7/08
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/41]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektronisches Endgerät[2000/05]
English:Electronic terminal apparatus[2000/05]
French:Terminal électronique[2000/05]
Examination procedure18.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
03.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
13.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI
21.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2003Fee for grant paid
05.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4954823  (BINSTEAD RONALD P [GB]) [X] 1,2,6-10 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 10; figures 2-5 * * column 4, lines 34-50; claims 6-10 * * column 5, lines 18-56 * [Y] 3-5,11-15;
 [Y]GB2291726  (HALPERN JOHN WOLFGANG [GB]) [Y] 3-5 * the whole document *;
 [YA]US5180901  (HIRAMATSU KENICHI [JP]) [Y] 11 * column 4, lines 42-45 * * column 9, lines 54-57 * [A] 3;
 [Y]US5099227  (GEISZLER THEODORE D [US], et al) [Y] 12-15 * column 3, lines 27-49 * * column 4, lines 43-47 *