Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0894629

EP0894629 - An ink jet printer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/42]For all designated states
Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP
Former [1999/05]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha TEC
570 Ohito, Ohito-cho, Tagata-gun
Shizuoka 410-2392 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ito, Takuro
36-12, Nakatokura, Shimizcho
Sunto-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP
02 / Kouzu, Norio
1096-2, Yoshida Ohitocho
Tagata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP
03 / Suzuki, Yasuihiro
1385-5, Okanomiya
Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
04 / Fujii, Shinichiro
4485-9, Asahigaoka
Mishima-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
[1999/05]
Representative(s)Hulse, Thomas Arnold , et al
Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane
Sheffield S1 2EX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/05]Hulse, Thomas Arnold , et al
Hulse & Co, St. James House, 8th Floor, Vicar Lane
Sheffield S1 2EX / GB
Application number, filing date98306035.129.07.1998
[1999/05]
Priority number, dateJP1997020423430.07.1997         Original published format: JP 20423497
JP1997025571319.09.1997         Original published format: JP 25571397
JP1998006835318.03.1998         Original published format: JP 6835398
[1999/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0894629
Date:03.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0894629
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/165
[1999/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/41]
Former [1999/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahldrucker[1999/05]
English:An ink jet printer[1999/05]
French:Imprimante à jet d'encre[1999/05]
Examination procedure12.08.1998Examination requested  [1999/05]
10.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2005Fee for grant paid
02.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR11.05.2005
DE12.08.2005
[2008/52]
Former [2008/45]FR31.07.2005
DE12.08.2005
Former [2006/35]DE12.08.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US4819012  (KIYOHARA TAKEHIKO ET AL) [A] 1 * column 8, line 30 - column 9, line 60; figures 2,4 *;
 [A]EP0605121  (XEROX CORP) [A] 1 * column 4, line 52 - column 7, line 15; figure 2 *;
 [A]JPH08150722  ;
 [A]JPH04197638
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 096, no. 010, & JP08150722 A 19960611 (CANON INC) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921029), vol. 016, no. 529, Database accession no. (M - 1332), & JP04197638 A 19920717 (CANON INC) [A] 1 * abstract *