Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0897707

EP0897707 - Compression system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.10.2006
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.10.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.11.2006  [2006/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY PLC
310-312 Dallow Road
Luton
Bedfordshire LU1 1TD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/48]For all designated states
HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY PLC
310-312 Dallow Road Luton
Bedfordshire LU1 1TD / GB
Former [1999/08]For all designated states
HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY PLC
310-312 Dallow Road
Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 1TD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Hampson, David Mark
34 Highfields, Llandaff
South Glamorgan, Cardiff, CF5 2QB / GB
02 / Schild, Rolf
5 Byron Drive
London, N2 0BD / GB
03 / Hutflesz, Heather Elizabeth
74 Poplars Road, Hillgrove, Mardy
Abergavenny, Gwent, NP7 6LT / GB
[1999/08]
Representative(s)Thaker, Shalini
Huntleigh Technology plc
310-312 Dallow Road
Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 1TD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/08]Thaker, Shalini
Huntleigh Technology plc 310-312 Dallow Road
Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 1TD / GB
Application number, filing date98306079.930.07.1998
[1999/08]
Priority number, dateGB1997001685109.08.1997         Original published format: GB 9716851
[1999/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0897707
Date:24.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0897707
Date:29.01.2003
[2003/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0897707
Date:30.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61H23/04
[1999/08]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2003/42]
Former [1999/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kompressionssystem[1999/08]
English:Compression system[1999/08]
French:Système de compression[1999/08]
Examination procedure27.09.1999Examination requested  [1999/47]
07.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2005Fee for grant paid
20.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5307791  (SENOUE MASAHARU ET AL) [X] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 7 - line 8; figures 2,6 * * column 3, line 44 - line 46 * * column 7, line 53 - line 56 * * column 1, line 61 - line 62 * [Y] 2,5-8,12;
 [Y]US4696289  (FOX ROGER H ET AL) [Y] 2,6-8,12 * column 2, line 31 - line 45 * * column 3, line 13 - line 17 * * column 3, line 55 - line 59 * * column 4, line 40 - line 43 * * column 8, line 63 *;
 [Y]US4453538  (WHITNEY JOHN K) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 49 - line 52 *;
 [A]US3901221  (NICHOLSON JAMES E ET AL) [A] * the whole document *;
 [X]US4827912  (CARRINGTON MICHAEL R ET AL) [X] 10,11 * column 3, line 2 - line 59; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US5435009  (SCHILD ROLF ET AL) [X] 10,11 * figure 4 *;
 [A]US4910889  (BONAVENTURE LAURENT ET AL) [A] 10,11 * figure 8 *