EP0894640 - Printer apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 1, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekiya, Hiroaki c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Seino, Takumi c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 98306098.9 | 30.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | JP19970205065 | 30.07.1997 Original published format: JP 20506597 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0894640 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0894640 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/38, B41J25/316 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
B41J25/304 (EP);
B41J25/316 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/05] | B41J29/38 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/14] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckvorrichtung | [1999/05] | English: | Printer apparatus | [1999/05] | French: | Appareil d'impression | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 09.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/23] | 27.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0324129 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 8, line 10 - line 12 * * column 8, line 22 - line 32 * * column 9, line 5 - line 37 * * column 10, line 13 - line 28 * * column 3, line 46 - line 50 * * figures 1-4,9-12 * [Y] 3; | [PXA]EP0806297 (FUJITSU TAKAMISAWA COMPONENT [JP]) [PX] 1 * column 12, line 52 - column 13, line 20 * * figures 2A,2B,7A,7B * * column 3, line 44 - line 47 * [A] 5; | [DY]US5599113 (SUZUKI MINORU [JP], et al) [DY] 3 * figures 6-9 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 12 *; | [X]JPH04166373 ; | [A]JPS648055 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [A]EP0515234 (SUMMIT WORLD TRADE CORP [US]) [A] 1 * figures 8A,8B * * page 5, line 25 - line 31 * * abstract *; | [A]JPS62174167 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920929), vol. 016, no. 467, Database accession no. (M - 1317), & JP04166373 A 19920612 (BROTHER IND LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880116), vol. 012, no. 014, Database accession no. (M - 659), & JP62174167 A 19870730 (TOSHIBA CORP;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH07309052 |