Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0896031

EP0896031 - Thermally conductive silicone composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.09.2003
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.10.2003  [2003/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/06]For all designated states
SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD.
6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamada, Kunihiro, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
Silicon Elec. Mat. Res. Ctr., 7-10, Oaza Hitomi
Matsuidacho, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP
02 / Takahashi, Takayuki, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
Silicon Elec. Mat. Res. Ctr., 7-10, Oaza Hitomi
Matsuidacho, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP
03 / Isobe, Kenichi, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
Silicon Elec. Mat. Res. Ctr., 7-10, Oaza Hitomi
Matsuidacho, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP
[1999/06]
Representative(s)Bubb, Antony John Allen , et al
Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/06]Bubb, Antony John Allen , et al
GEE & CO. Chancery House Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
Application number, filing date98306237.304.08.1998
[1999/06]
Priority number, dateJP1997022571506.08.1997         Original published format: JP 22571597
[1999/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0896031
Date:10.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0896031
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0896031
Date:30.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08L83/04
[1999/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/40]
Former [1999/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wärmeleitende Siliconzusammensetzung[1999/06]
English:Thermally conductive silicone composition[1999/06]
French:Composition de silicone conductrice de chaleur[1999/06]
Examination procedure26.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
09.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2002Fee for grant paid
15.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
Opposition(s)31.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:SearchJPH02153995  [ ] (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO);
 [A]US4265775  (AAKALU NANDAKUMAR G, et al) [A] 1-10;
 [D]JPS5736302B  [D] * example 1 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5221339  (TAKAHASHI TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4 - column 5 *;
 [D]JPH02212556  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO)
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19901001), vol. 113, no. 14, Database accession no. 118256, XP002124480 [A] 1-10 * abstract *