Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978954

EP0978954 - LEO mobile satellite communication system with congestion control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.08.2002
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.10.2002  [2002/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ICO Services Ltd.
1 Queen Caroline Street
London W6 9BN / GB
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Lu, Sze-Ching
113 St. James Road
Sutton, Surrey SM1 2TJ / GB
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date98306241.504.08.1998
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978954
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/185
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [2000/43]
Former [2000/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  LI 
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Überlastungregelung für LEO mobile Satelliten Kommunikationsanordnung[2000/06]
English:LEO mobile satellite communication system with congestion control[2000/06]
French:Système de gestion de congestion pour système de communication par satellites LEO[2000/06]
Examination procedure04.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
01.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/41]
10.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0780997  (TRW INC [US]) [Y] 1,8,15,22 * column 4, line 20 - column 10, line 26 * [A] 6,7,13,14,20,21,27,28;
 [YA]EP0658014  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 1,8,15,22 * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 21 * [A] 2,4,5,9,11,12,16,18,19,23,25,26;
 [A]EP0717579  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 2,5,9,12,16,19,23,26 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 12 *;
 [A]WO9619905  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-28 * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]EP0848506  (ICO SERVICES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-28 * claims 1-24 *