Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0896931

EP0896931 - Container with opening feature [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Westvaco Corporation
299 Park Avenue New York
New York 10171 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/07]For all designated states
WESTVACO CORPORATION
299 Park Avenue
New York New York 10171 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Calvert, Barry Gene
Route 4, Mounting Lake
Covington, Virginia 24426 / US
[1999/07]
Representative(s)Jackson, Peter
Barker Brettell 10-12 Priests Bridge
London SW15 5JE / GB
[2009/50]
Former [1999/07]Jackson, Peter
Barker Brettell 10-12 Priests Bridge
London SW15 5JE / GB
Application number, filing date98306255.505.08.1998
[1999/07]
Priority number, dateUS1997090902811.08.1997         Original published format: US 909028
[1999/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0896931
Date:17.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0896931
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:B65D77/20
[1999/07]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1999/43]
Former [1999/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verpackung mit Öffnungsvorrichtung[1999/07]
English:Container with opening feature[1999/07]
French:Emballage avec moyens d'ouverture[1999/07]
Examination procedure12.09.1998Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/30]
30.11.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT
18.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2001Fee for grant paid
07.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.09.1999AT   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.1999CH   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.1999CY   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.1999DK   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.1999ES   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.1999IT   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB05.08.2002
[2004/21]
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE3618237  (BEMPFLINGER FRUECHTEKONSERVEN [DE]) [Y] 1-5,7,8 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE2202686  (HAUSTRUP EKCO ALUMINIUM EMBALL) [Y] 1-5,7,8 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 3; figure 4 *;
 [YD]US4955530  (RIGBY WILLIAM R [US], et al) [YD] 1-5,7 * column 1, line 5 - line 22 *
by applicantUS2973087
 US3863832
 US4955530
 US5516035