blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0921319


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.10.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  26.11.2003  [2003/48]
01.10.2003 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
18.06.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn
14.03.2003 Examination report or reply
01.11.2002 Examination report or reply
01.11.2002 First examination report
30.08.2002 Renewal fee
23.08.2001 Renewal fee
25.09.2000 Change - extension states
25.08.2000 Renewal fee
28.07.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  13.09.2000 [2000/37]
14.07.2000 Request for examination filed published on  30.08.2000 [2000/35]
19.11.1999 Publication of search report published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
19.11.1999 Change - classification published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
23.04.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.06.1999 [1999/23]