blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0921319
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0921319Global Dossier 05.01.2000A3
EP0921319 09.06.1999A2
Priority number Date
US98658797 08.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6073593 13.06.2000A
Priority number Date
US98658797 08.12.1997