Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0921319

EP0921319 - Plastic fan and thermal clutch drive [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harvard Industries, Inc.
1999 Wildwood Avenue Jackson
Michigan 49202 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]For all designated states
Harvard Industries, Inc.
1999 Wildwood Avenue
Jackson, Michigan 49202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Nilson, Carl A.
2966 Wolhaven
Jackson, Michigan 49201 / US
02 / Kennedy, Lawrence Craig
5301 Newell Circle
Kettering, Ohio 45440 / US
[1999/23]
Representative(s)Price, Nigel John King
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]Price, Nigel John King
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98306316.507.08.1998
[1999/23]
Priority number, dateUS1997098658708.12.1997         Original published format: US 986587
[1999/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0921319
Date:09.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0921319
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:F04D29/26, F04D25/02, F04D29/32
[2000/01]
Former International [1999/23]F04D29/26, F04D25/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/37]
Former [1999/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kunststofflüfter und thermische Kupplung[1999/23]
English:Plastic fan and thermal clutch drive[1999/23]
French:Ventilateur en plastique et embrayage thermique[1999/23]
Examination procedure05.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
06.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/48]
23.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19618629  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 7; figures 1,2 * [A] 4;
 [XA]US4150919  (MATUCHESKI JOSEPH V [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 27; figures 1-3 * [A] 4;
 [XA]EP0701064  (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 25 - column 6, line 38; figures 1-5 * [A] 4;
 [A]US5358382  (MUEHLBACH GUENTHER [DE]) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 *;
 [A]GB876548  (MANFRED BEHR);
 [A]GB1256039  (AISIN SEIKI [JP])