Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0903881

EP0903881 - Detecting digital multiplexer faults [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.12.2005
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/12]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Habegger, Kenneth Leon
607 Harlowe Court
Naperville, Illinois 60565 / US
02 / Poole, Ronald Keith
3852 Celeste Lane
Warrenville, Illinois 60564 / US
03 / Molen, Karen Louise
28W751 87 Street
Naperville, Illinois 60564 / US
04 / Salazar, Jaime E.
6417 Abilene Trail
Austin, Texas 78749 / US
05 / Sosinski, Mark Roman
6930 Terrace Drive
Downers Grove, Illinois 60516 / US
06 / Sparber, Richard Grant
2033 Gladstone Drive
Wheaton, Illinois 60187 / US
[1999/23]
Former [1999/12]01 / Habegger, Kenneth Leon
607 Harlowe Court
Naperville, Illinois 60565 / US
02 / Poole, Ronald Keith
3852 Celeste Lane
Warrenville, Illinois 60564 / US
03 / Molen, Karen Louise
28W751 87 Street
Naperville, Illinois 60564 / US
04 / Salazar, Jaime E.
30W027 Penny Lane
Warrenville, Illinois 60555 / US
05 / Sosinski, Mark Roman
6930 Terrace Drive
Downers Grove, Illinois 60516 / US
06 / Sparber, Richard Grant
2033 Gladstone Drive
Wheaton, Illinois 60187 / US
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Patent Business
c/o Nokia
125 Finsbury Pavement
London EC2A 1NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2005/25]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [1999/12]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date98306393.411.08.1998
[1999/12]
Priority number, dateUS1997092099329.08.1997         Original published format: US 920993
[1999/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0903881
Date:24.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0903881
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04J3/14, H04L1/02, H04L1/14
[1999/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/23]
Former [1999/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Erkennung von Fehlern in digitalen Multiplexern[1999/12]
English:Detecting digital multiplexer faults[1999/12]
French:Détections des fauts dans multiplexeurs numériques[1999/12]
Examination procedure07.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/19]
08.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/04]
26.07.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4993013  (SHINADA SHIGEO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 1 - column 2, line 38 *;
 [A]JPS6084035
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850911), vol. 009, no. 225, Database accession no. (E - 342), [A] 1 * abstract *