Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0904970

EP0904970 - Motor vehicle engine speed control with optional cruise control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.06.2004  [2004/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc.
Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, One Parkland Boulevard
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc.
Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, One Parkland Boulevard
Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc.
Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard
Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Heslop, Garon Nigel
12 Mount View
Billericay, Essex, CM11 1HB / GB
[1999/13]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway
Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date98306638.219.08.1998
[1999/13]
Priority number, dateGB1997002077630.09.1997         Original published format: GB 9720776
[1999/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0904970
Date:31.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0904970
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0904970
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60K31/04
[1999/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/44]
Former [1999/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drehzahlreglersysteme für Kraftfahrzeug-Brennkraftmaschine mit wahlweiser Fahrgeschwindigkeitsregelung[1999/13]
English:Motor vehicle engine speed control with optional cruise control[1999/13]
French:Système de régulation de vitesse moteur avec commande de vitesse de croisière optionelle[1999/13]
Examination procedure14.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
12.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2003Fee for grant paid
22.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0353072  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,6,8 * column 6, line 28 - line 37; figure 3A *
by applicantEP0353072